Al-Shammari, Fahad (CPSO#: 68506)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 04 Aug 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 04 Aug 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 04 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 04 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2000