Al-Shaqsi, Sultan Zayid Khalifa (CPSO#: 108834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 08 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rotman School of Management
Stewart Building 5th Floor
Div of Plastic Surgery Suite 508
149 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: (416) 978-8534
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULTAN ZAYID KHALIFA AL-SHAQSI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-SHAQSI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-SHAQSI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-SHAQSI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-SHAQSI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-SHAQSI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-SHAQSI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2016 to 07 Jul 2016
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018