Al-Shayji, Ayman Fahad (CPSO#: 69478)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurosurgery
Trillium Health Centre
210-101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 566-9750
Fax: (905) 566-9717
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003