Al-Shehri, Mohammed Abdullah Mohammed (CPSO#: 64224)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1997