Al-Shehri, Saad Ahmed Mohammed (CPSO#: 70973)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 30 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1998