Al-Shoura, Amani Amin Ibrahim (CPSO#: 73114)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 19 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 1999 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2002