AlShumrani, Mesbah Jari Ali (CPSO#: 101596)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015