Al-Shuwaikhat, Abdulah Mahdi (CPSO#: 62977)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Nov 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 1993