Al-Sofayan, Mohammad Saud (CPSO#: 70999)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 1998