Al-Sofyani, Medhat Mahmoud M Safar (CPSO#: 70617)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2004