Al-Sughayir, Ammar Hasan Ali (CPSO#: 85564)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009