Al-Sulaimani, Ayman Fouad (CPSO#: 77087)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 21 Dec 2001
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2002 to 31 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2002