Al-Sunaid, Areej Rashed Sunaid (CPSO#: 99067)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 16 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2016 to 06 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2016