Al-Suwaida, Kerrayim Omar (CPSO#: 71802)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 07 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 1999 to 07 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2000 to 07 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2001 to 07 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003