Al-Swaid, Abdul Rahman Faiz Abdullah (CPSO#: 69763)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jan 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 1998