Al-Tayyar, Ahmed Haytham Ahmed Adeeb (CPSO#: 84447)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2006 to 05 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011