Al-Thani, Hassan Ali S A (CPSO#: 69720)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003