Al-Thaqfi, Saif Abdulaziz A (CPSO#: 88201)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2014