Al-Trabolsi, Hassan Ali Mohammad (CPSO#: 67520)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1999