Al-Turki, Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 67234)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998