Al-Turki, Turki Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 68465)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jul 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Jul 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999