Al-Twegieri, Al-Taher Ali (CPSO#: 65715)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994