Al-Yabes, Ohoud Abdulrahman Abdullah (CPSO#: 96239)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2013