Al-Yousef, Sawsan Mowaffaq Mohammed (CPSO#: 76936)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003