Al-Za'abi, Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 75643)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 07 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2001 to 07 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2002 to 07 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2003 to 07 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008