Al-Zahrani, Hassan Ahmed Marwan (CPSO#: 97378)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 23 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 May 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013