Al-Zahrani, Nasser Ahmed Jaboul (CPSO#: 68384)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 8 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002