Al-Zaid, Khalid Mohammed Saad (CPSO#: 66198)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Jan 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jan 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1998