Al-Zamil, Sabreen A Z S (CPSO#: 70884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 20 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 22 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 1998