Ala, Brigitte Darleen (CPSO#: 63766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WRA X-Ray Clinics
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: (519) 256-4358
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 37531
Fax: (519) 256-4358
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brigitte Ala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ala ( CPSO# 63766 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Radiological Associates
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4914

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4412

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 17, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 18, 2017, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, and s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that conditions were placed on Dr. Brigitte Ala’s privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital for the 2017/2018 credentialing year requiring Dr. Ala to complete an individualized professionalism coaching program.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIGITTE DARLEEN ALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992