Alabdullah, Hafez Mahmoud (CPSO#: 99472)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Damascus, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014