Aladwani, Muneerah S M Z (CPSO#: 78349)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2004