Alagar, Ravikumar (CPSO#: 66285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alagar Medical Associates
Suite 400
1350 Locust Street
Pittsburgh PA  15219
United States
Phone: (412) 690-2352
Fax: (412) 690-2355

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVIKUMAR ALAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAGAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002