Alageel, Asem Abdulaziz Saleh (CPSO#: 110742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 09 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 6508
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASEM ABDULAZIZ SALEH ALAGEEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALAGEEL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALAGEEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAGEEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALAGEEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALAGEEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALAGEEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Nov 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 08 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2017