Alageeli, Mohammad Hussain H (CPSO#: 99982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-6858500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD HUSSAIN H ALAGEELI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALAGEELI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALAGEELI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAGEELI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALAGEELI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALAGEELI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALAGEELI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018