Alagiyawanna, Thilak Rameshkumara (CPSO#: 87669)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: Alagiyawanna, Alagiyawanna Mohotti Appuhamilage Thilak Rameshkumara (used until: 17 Sep 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Colombo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 24 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Oct 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008