Alahmadi, Hussein Ibrahim J (CPSO#: 80630)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 08 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2004 to 08 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2005 to 08 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2006 to 08 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 08 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011