Alahmadi, Khalid Omar Awad (CPSO#: 82299)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Apr 2005 to 19 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012