Alahmadi, Majed Dakhel Aide (CPSO#: 92116)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Dec 2010 to 25 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Dec 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017