Alakkad, Husni Abdulrahman O (CPSO#: 86164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 40327
Department of Anaesthesia
KFHU, University of Dammam
Al Khobar 31952
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966-554466777

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSNI ABDULRAHMAN O ALAKKAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAKKAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 19 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2010 to 19 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014