Alam, Naheed (CPSO#: 95143)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naheed Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015