Alam, Syed Khursheed (CPSO#: 80334)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007