Alam, Zeenat Yasmin (CPSO#: 50061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Y. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Alam ( CPSO# 50061 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEENAT YASMIN ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988