Alamadi, Ahmad Mohammad Haider Ali (CPSO#: 80415)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 22 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004