Alanazi, Haitham Ahmed S (CPSO#: 81280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012