Alanazi, Nora Khalid M (CPSO#: 111754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Complex Care
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORA KHALID M ALANAZI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALANAZI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALANAZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALANAZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALANAZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALANAZI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALANAZI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Apr 2017 to 21 Jun 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018