Alanezi, Ahmad Ayadah M (CPSO#: 110904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 25 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Qassim University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Childrens Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD AYADAH M ALANEZI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALANEZI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALANEZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALANEZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALANEZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALANEZI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALANEZI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2016 to 24 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018