Alangh, Manreet (CPSO#: 96076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7 Building A
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Phone: (519) 658-6800
Fax: (519) 658-6801
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
715 Fischer-Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON  N2E 4E9
Canada
Phone: 519-745-3690
Fax: 519-745-4856
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manreet Alangh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alangh ( CPSO# 96076 )

Business Address:
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Building A Suite 7
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANREET ALANGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALANGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016