Alarab, May Abdul Ghani Mouhi Al-Deen Sheikh (CPSO#: 80405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8428
Fax: (416) 586-8387
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alarab Awad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Awad ( CPSO# 80399 )
Dr. M. Alarab ( CPSO# 80405 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook & Women's College HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M3 - 200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 380-5347

Business Address:
The Holland Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
Kensington Clinic
340 College Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 12 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  May  Abdul  Ghani  Mouhi  Al-Deen  Sheikh  Alarab  may  practise  medicine
            independently in Obstetrics and Gynaecology.