Alarakhia, Mohamed (CPSO#: 88754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2H 0E2
Phone: (519) 904-0656
Fax: (519) 904-0658
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 783-0023
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Canada
Phone: (519) 578-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamed Alarakhia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alarakhia ( CPSO# 88754 )

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0023

Business Address:
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2H 0E2
Phone Number: (519) 904-0656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ALARAKHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARAKHIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010